EP0670627 - Method for commutating and starting up synchronous machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Dr. Johannes-Heidenhain-Strasse 5 83301 Traunreut / DE | [1999/51] |
Former [1997/15] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Dr. Johannes-Heidenhain-Strasse 5 D-83301 Traunreut / DE | ||
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hentschke, Bernd, Dipl. Ing. Grundig AG, Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fuerth / DE | [1995/36] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1997/15] |
Former [1995/36] | Dreykorn-Lindner, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Grundig AG Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz D-90748 Fuerth / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103027.9 | 03.03.1995 | [1995/36] | Priority number, date | DE19944407390 | 05.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4407390 | [1995/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670627 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670627 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02P1/46 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
H02P6/21 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/36] | H02P6/20 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren für den Anlauf und die Kommutierung bei Synchronmaschinen | [1995/36] | English: | Method for commutating and starting up synchronous machines | [1995/36] | French: | Procédé pour le démarrage et la commutation de machines synchrones | [1995/36] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0251785 (CONNER PERIPHERALS INC [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 5, line 16 - line 22 * * column 3, line 22 - line 28; figure 7 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 9; figure 4 *; | [X]EP0517393 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 6, line 32 - line 51; figure 1 * | [X] - M.EHSANI & AL., "Elimination of discrete position sensor and current sensor in switched reluctance motor drives", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 1990 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING, SEATTLE, WASHINGTON, (19901007), pages 518 - 524 [X] 1,3 * page 521, column 2, paragraph 1; figure 2 * |