EP0674118 - Device for monitoring the piston stroke of a pneumatically actuated brake cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 D-80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bieker, Dieter Primelweg 2 D-83064 Raubling / DE | 02 /
Baumgartner, Hans Thonstetten 11 1/4 D-85368 Moosburg / DE | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [1998/20] | Specht, Peter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Loesenbeck, Stracke, Loesenbeck, Patentanwälte, Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [1997/05] | Specht, Peter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103397.6 | 09.03.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | DE19944409351 | 18.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4409351 | [1995/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0674118 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16D66/02, B60T17/22 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
F16D65/28 (EP);
B60T17/081 (EP);
B60T17/22 (EP);
F16D66/025 (EP);
F16D66/028 (EP);
F16D2066/003 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/39] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Überwachung des Kolbenhubs eines pneumatisch betätigbaren Bremszylinders | [1995/39] | English: | Device for monitoring the piston stroke of a pneumatically actuated brake cylinder | [1995/39] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de la course du piston d'un cylindre de frein à actionnement pneumatique | [1995/39] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 18.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/44] | 17.06.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4642603 (MARTINEZ, JR.) [X] 1,2,10,17 * column W * [Y] 3,4,14; | [XY]GB1512003 (HOPE TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS) [X] 1 * page 2, line 74 - line 117; figure - * [Y] 3,4; | [X]GB1282835 (BROMSREGULATOR) [X] 1,17 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3909904 (ROBERT BOSCH) [X] 1,17 * figures 2,3; claims 1,2 *; | [XA]US5206625 (DAVIS) [X] 1,17 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 51; figures 1,6,7 * [A] 21; | [Y]DE2118875 (ALFRED TEVES) [Y] 14 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1265162 (SELF ENERGISING DISC BRAKES) [A] 3,10,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3640701 (WILHELM ET AL.) [A] 14 * claim - *; | [A]GB2232733 (ALFRED TEVES) [A] 2,3,14 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 9; figure . * |