EP0679008 - Circuit for filtering of meter-pulsis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2001/19] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zojer, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Würmlach 2a A-9640 Kötschach / AT | 02 /
Gazsi, Lajos, Dr. Ing. Faunastrasse 23 D-40239 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
Linder, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Am Anger 9a A-9800 Villach / AT | [2001/39] |
Former [1995/43] | 01 /
Zojer, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Würmlach 2a A-9640 Kötschach / DE | ||
02 /
Gazsi, Lajos, Dr. Ing. Faunastrasse 23 D-40239 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03 /
Linder, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Am Anger 9a A-9800 Villach / DE | Representative(s) | Zedlitz, Peter, et al OSRAM GmbH Intellectual Property IP Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf., et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103516.1 | 10.03.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | DE19944410058 | 23.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4410058 | [1995/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0679008 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0679008 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
H04M15/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/43] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Gebührenimpulsfilterung | [1995/43] | English: | Circuit for filtering of meter-pulsis | [1995/43] | French: | Circuit à filtre d'impulsion de métrage | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.10.2001 | AT | 10.03.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/47] | AT | 10.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4829517 (MALEK MONI [DE])[A] 1; | [A]US5172407 (ALENIUS HANS [SE]) [A] 1 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 1 |