Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0736993
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.09.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] |
05.10.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] |
14.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
15.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
09.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.02.2001 |
Change - English title |
published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |
22.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.04.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] |
25.03.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.10.1996 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] |
10.10.1996 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
23.08.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] |
26.06.1996 |
Loss of particular rights |
|