blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0736993

EP0736993 - Method for monitoring specific telephone connections in a central monitoring unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/41]Method for the targeted supervision of telephone connections in a supervision exchange of a higher level
[2001/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.09.2002
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.11.2002  [2002/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/41]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kuhn, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Engertstr. 2
D-82131 Stockdorf / DE
02 / Käss, Manfred
Woehlerstr. 55
D-81247 München / DE
[1996/41]
Application number, filing date95103517.910.03.1995
[1996/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0736993
Date:09.10.1996
Language:DE
[1996/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0736993
Date:21.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.1995
ClassificationIPC:H04M3/20, H04M3/42, H04M3/22
[1996/41]
CPC:
H04M3/2281 (EP); H04M3/42221 (EP); H04M3/36 (EP);
H04M3/54 (EP); H04M3/56 (EP); H04M7/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1996/48]
Former [1996/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur gezielten Überwachung von Fernsprechverbindungen in einer übergeordneten Überwachungszentrale[1996/41]
English:Method for monitoring specific telephone connections in a central monitoring unit[2001/15]
French:Méthode pour la surveillance ciblée de connexions téléphoniques dans une unité de surveillance centrale[2001/15]
Former [1996/41]Method for the targeted supervision of telephone connections in a supervision exchange of a higher level
Former [1996/41]Méthode pour la supervision cible de connections téléphoniques dans un central de supervision de niveau supérieur
Examination procedure12.03.1996Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.06.1996Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
08.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/23]
14.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2001Fee for grant paid
06.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.03.1996AT   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.1996
17.04.1996BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.04.1996CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.03.1996DE   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.1996
17.04.1996DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.04.1996ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.03.1996FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.1996
11.03.1996GB   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.1996
17.04.1996GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.04.1996IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.04.1996IT   M01   Not yet paid
17.04.1996LI   M01   Not yet paid
17.04.1996LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.04.1996MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.04.1996NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.04.1996PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.03.1996SE   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.1996
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2520925  (ELMEG) [A] 1 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 2 *;
 [A]EP0161031  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1* page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 13 *;
 [A]EP0218862  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column A *;
 [A]CH681409  (SIEMENS AG ALBIS) [A] 1 * column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 14 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.