EP0675222 - Sized aramid fibres and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neuert, Richard, Dr. Brunnerweg 2 D-90610 Winkelhaid / DE | 02 /
Stein, Gerhard Nelkenstrasse 13 D-93309 Kelheim / DE | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/36] | Schweitzer, Klaus Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1998/14] | Schweitzer, Klaus, Dr. Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103743.1 | 15.03.1995 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | DE19944410708 | 28.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4410708 | [1995/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0675222 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0675222 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D06M13/224, D06M15/53, D06M13/342 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
D01F6/605 (EP,US);
D06M13/17 (EP,US);
D06M13/224 (EP,US);
D06M13/2246 (EP,US);
D06M13/342 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/40] | D06M13/224, D06M13/342 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/40] | Title | German: | Präparationshaltige Aramidfasern und deren Verwendung | [1995/40] | English: | Sized aramid fibres and their use | [1995/40] | French: | Fibres d'aramide usinées et leur utilisation | [1995/40] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 05.02.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/14] | 12.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2350419 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0163403 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [DA]EP0416486 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]DE3929376 (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0547846 (MILLIKEN RES CORP [US]) [A] 1* claim - * |