EP0677747 - Capacitive sensor for detecting high voltage signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bumen, Werner Bachstrasse 75 D-73230 Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
Kleger, Bruno, Ing. Auf dem Aurain 27 F-73340 Amstetten / DE | [1995/42] | Application number, filing date | 95103811.6 | 16.03.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | DE19944412642 | 13.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4412642 | [1995/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677747 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677747 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/06, F02P17/00, G01R31/00, G01R1/07, G01R15/16 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
F02P17/12 (EP);
G01R15/16 (EP);
F02P2017/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/42] | G01R15/06, F02P17/00, G01R31/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/42] | Title | German: | Kapazitiver Sensor zum Erfassen von Hochspannungssignalen | [1995/42] | English: | Capacitive sensor for detecting high voltage signals | [1995/42] | French: | Capteur capacitif de détection de signaux haute tension | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/39] | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4090130 (J.F.WILLENBECHER,JR.) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - line 54 * * column 2, line 36 - line 43 *; | [A]US5001431 (G.A.GARASIMOWICZ ET AL.) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - line 68 *; | [A]EP0192057 (ROSE) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 1 * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 2 * |