EP0672760 - Wear resistant cast aluminum alloy and process of producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Light Metal Co., Ltd. 13-12, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states Nippon Light Metal Co., Ltd. 13-12, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221 / JP | |||
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states Nippon Light Metal Co., Ltd. 13-12, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states Nippon Light Metal Co., Ltd. 13-12, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo-to, 108 / JP | ||
For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuramasu, Yukio, c/o Nikkei Techno Research Company, Ltd., No. 34-1, 1-chome, Kambara Kambara-cho, Ihara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Akio, c/o Nikkei Techno Research Company, Ltd., No. 34-1, 1-chome, Kambara Kambara-cho, Ihara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Namekawa, Yoji, c/o Nippon Light Metal Co., Ltd. No. 13-12, 3-chome, Mita Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kitaoka, Sanji, c/o Nippon Light Metal Co., Ltd. No. 13-12, 3-chome, Mita Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Watanabe, Koji 1658-4, Fukaya-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Tsushima, Kenji 2-13-2-402, Tsurugaoka Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 07 /
Sayashi, Mamoru 10-16, Ogami-cho Miura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103852.0 | 16.03.1995 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | JP19940045963 | 16.03.1994 Original published format: JP 4596394 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0672760 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0672760 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/04, C22C21/02 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
C22C21/02 (EP,US);
B22D21/007 (EP,US);
B22D27/04 (EP,US);
C22C21/04 (EP,US);
F02F2007/009 (EP,US);
F05C2201/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/38] | Title | German: | Verschliessfeste Gusslegierung aus Aluminium und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1995/38] | English: | Wear resistant cast aluminum alloy and process of producing same | [1995/38] | French: | Alliage de fonderie à base d'aluminium et procédé de fabrication | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 17.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH0578770 | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930729), vol. 17, no. 406, Database accession no. (C - 1090), & JP5078770 A 19930330 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO LTD) [DX] 1-11 * example 11 * |