EP0673999 - Trehalose phosphorylase and preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 9-11, Nihonbashi Horidomecho 1 chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 9-11, Nihonbashi Horidomecho 1 chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Eisaku 3-10-13, Nerima, Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Eiichi 164, Asahidai, Kanayama-machi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima / JP | 03 /
Saitoh, Kohki B-4-2, 154-1, Harada, Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima / JP | 04 /
Wada, Toshihiko 8, Ichigaya-daimachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Konai, Yutaka A-401, 1480-2, Nogaya-machi Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104065.8 | 20.03.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | JP19940076461 | 23.03.1994 Original published format: JP 7646194 | [1995/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0673999 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0673999 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12P21/02, C12P19/12 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
C12N9/1051 (EP,US);
C12P19/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/39] | C12N9/10, C12P21/02, C07H1/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/39] | Title | German: | Threhalose Phosphorylase und deren Herstellung | [1995/39] | English: | Trehalose phosphorylase and preparation thereof | [1995/39] | French: | Trehalose phosphorylase et sa production | [1995/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 06.04.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JPH06189779 ; | [PX]EP0639645 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-13 * example 1; claims * | [DXA] - KITAMOTO, Y. ET AL., "Alpha-glucose-1-phosphate formation by a nover trehalose phosphorylase from Flammulina velutipes", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, vol. 55, pages 147 - 150 [DX] 1-3,7,11-13 * whole disclosure * [A] 1-13 | [A] - SALMINEN, S.O. & STREETER, J.G., "Enzymes of alpha,alpha-trehalose metabolism in soybean nodules", PLANT PHYSIOL., vol. 81, pages 538 - 541 | [DA] - MARECHAL, L.R. & BELOCOPITOW, E., "Metabolism of trehalose in Euglena gracilis", J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 247, pages 3223 - 3228 | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 32, Database accession no. 94-259556, & JPH06189779 A 19940712 (KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY) [PX] 1-13 * abstract * |