EP0678676 - Valve stack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Festo AG & Co. Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states FESTO AG & Co Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states Festo KG Ruiter Strasse 82 D-73734 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stoll, Kurt, Dipl.Ing. Dr. Lenzhalde 72 D-73732 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Rüdle, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Ermsweg 10 D-73734 Esslingen / DE | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Abel, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Abel, Martin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. O. Reimold Dipl.-Phys. Dr. H. Vetter Dipl.-Ing. M. Abel Hölderlinweg 58 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104163.1 | 22.03.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | DE19944413657 | 20.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4413657 | [1995/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0678676 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0678676 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678676 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/00, F15B13/043 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
F15B13/0839 (EP,US);
F15B13/08 (KR);
F15B13/0857 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86614 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87209 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87885 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/43] | F15B15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1995/43] | Title | German: | Ventilanordnung | [1995/43] | English: | Valve stack | [1995/43] | French: | Bloc-valve | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 18.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2443981 (HERION WERKE KG) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4257572 (NEFF JAMES A) [A] 1,6,12 * figures 7-9 *; | [A]US4726393 (HERNER RAY H [US]) [A] 1,6,12 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2254909 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [DA]DE4143274 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [DA] 1,6,12 * figure 1; claim 1 * |