EP0673719 - Impeller wheel with fixed impeller wheel shovels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLICK-Roto-Jet Maschinenbau GmbH Heinrich-Schlick-Strasse 2 D-48629 Metelen / DE | [1995/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlick, Horst-Dieter Heinrich-Schlick-Strasse 8 D-48629 Metelen / DE | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmeister, Helmut Patentanwalt Postbox 38 28 48021 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Postbox 38 28 48021 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104253.0 | 23.03.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | DE19944410628 | 26.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4410628 | [1995/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0673719 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673719 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B24C5/06 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
B24C5/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/39] | Title | German: | Schleuderrad mit fixierten Schleuderrad-Schaufeln | [1995/39] | English: | Impeller wheel with fixed impeller wheel shovels | [1995/39] | French: | Roue centrifuge avec des aubes fixes | [1995/39] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 22.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3867791 (GOFF JAMES R) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, lines 58-63 * * column 3, lines 22-28; figures 1,2,4,6 *; | [Y]EP0094371 (VER EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [AT]) [Y] 1-5 * page 4; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US3444651 (GEISSELER MAX) [DA] 1 * figures 1,7,10,11 *; | [A]US4646483 (MANGAN JERRY M [US]); | [A]US4329819 (MAY HAROLD V); | [A]US2119813 (KEEFER WALTER L) |