EP0677568 - Process for marking industrial organic solvents and hydrocarbons used as fuels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 90139 Palermo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 I-90139 Palermo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Traverso, Enrico Via Monte Bianco 22 Monza (MI) / IT | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Gennari, Marco EniTecnologie S.p.A. Patent and Licensing Dept. Via F. Maritano, 26 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Gennari, Marco Eniricerche S.p.A., BREL, Via F. Maritano, 26 I-20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 95104394.2 | 24.03.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | IT1994MI00703 | 14.04.1994 Original published format: IT MI940703 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0677568 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/00, C10L3/00, G01N31/22, G01N1/30, C10L1/22 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
C10L1/003 (EP,US);
C10L1/14 (EP,US);
C10L1/231 (EP,US);
C10L1/1608 (EP,US);
C10L1/1824 (EP,US);
C10L1/1855 (EP,US);
C10L1/201 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/42] | Extension states | SI | 24.03.1995 | Title | German: | Verfahren um industrielle organische Lösemittel und als Brennstoffe benutzbare Kohlenwasserstoffe zu Markieren | [1995/42] | English: | Process for marking industrial organic solvents and hydrocarbons used as fuels | [1995/42] | French: | Procédé de marquage de solvants organiques industriels et d'hydrocarbures utilisés comme combustibles | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 01.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/13] | 29.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1448245 (VALDES MIGUEL LLOMPART Y, et al) [A] 1-9 * column W *; | [A]GB896450 (GRACE W R & CO) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3883568 (TURNER ROBERT J, et al) [A] 1-11 * column W *; | [A]EP0385441 (ACNA CHIMICA ORGANICA [IT]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X]DE3924596 (SPRÜGEL) [X] 10,11 * column 3, line 1 - line 4; claims 1,6 *; | [A]EP0565715 (YOSHIBI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [DA] - JONES ET AL., "COLORIMETRIC DETERMINATION OF NITROMETHANE IN THE PRESENCE OF OTHER NITROPARAFFINS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, US, vol. 28, no. 9, pages 1493 - 1495 [DA] 1-11 |