EP0674466 - Hearing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cohausz, Egbert Grunerstrasse 129 D-40239 Düsseldorf / DE | [1995/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1995/39] | COHAUSZ HASE DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104466.8 | 27.03.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | DE19944410445 | 25.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4410445 | [1995/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0674466 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
H04R25/00 (EP,US);
H04R2460/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/39] | Title | German: | Hörgerät | [1995/39] | English: | Hearing aid | [1995/39] | French: | Prothèse auditive | [1995/39] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 28.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/51] | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.06.1995 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.1995 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   27.07.1995 | 27.06.1995 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.1995 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.1995 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.05.1996 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4955729 (MARX GUENTER [DE]) [X] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 54 * * column 3, line 5 - column 8, line 43; figure - * [A] 2,6; | [X]DE3742529 (MARX GUENTER H) [X] 1,3 * claim - *; | [X]DE3804526 (SONAR DESIGN & HÖRTECHNIK GMBH) [X] 1,7 * figure .; claim - *; | [X]DE4034096 (VIELBERTH INST ENTW & FORSCH [DE]) [X] 1,4 * figure -; claim - * |