EP0673769 - Winding support for cleaning cloth for printing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baldwin Grafotec GmbH Derchinger Strasse 137-141 86165 Augsburg / DE | [1997/36] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states Baldwin-Gegenheimer GmbH Derchinger Strasse 137-141 D-86165 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waizmann, Franz Schulstrasse 39a D-86459 Gessertshausen / DE | 02 /
Anders-Woschick, Michael Werner Innsbrucker Strasse 33 D-86163 Augsburg / DE | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Ewald Otto Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter Postfach 10 26 05 D-86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104494.0 | 27.03.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | DE19944410642 | 26.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4410642 | [1995/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0673769 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673769 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
B41F35/00 (EP);
B41P2235/246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/39] | Title | German: | Wickelstand für Druckmaschinen-Waschtücher | [1995/39] | English: | Winding support for cleaning cloth for printing machines | [1995/39] | French: | Bobinoir pour tissu nettoyant pour machines d'impression | [1995/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 08.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.10.1997 | GB | 15.10.1997 | IT | 15.10.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 15.10.1997 | |
IT | 15.10.1997 | ||
FR | 13.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | GB | 15.10.1997 | |
FR | 13.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | GB | 15.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE9014229U (VLIESSTOFF KASPER GMBH) |