EP0677469 - Method and apparatus for treating a web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2001/05] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Voith Paper GmbH Birkschenweg 5 47803 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Finishing GmbH Birkschenweg 5 D-47803 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conrad, Hans-Rolf, Dipl. Ing. Friedenstrasse 28 D-41539 Dormagen / DE | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing., et al Kühhornshofweg 10 D-60320 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104598.8 | 29.03.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | DE19944412624 | 13.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4412624 | [1995/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677469 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677469 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677469 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D21G1/00 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B65H19/10 (EP,US);
D21G1/0093 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41734 (EP,US);
B65H2301/5142 (EP,US);
B65H2515/00 (EP,US);
B65H2515/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/42] | B65H23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Materialbahn | [1995/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for treating a web | [1995/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour traiter une bande de matériel | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/07] | 12.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3907168 (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI])[A] 1-16; | [A]DE4112537 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16; | [A]EP0578036 (TROESTER MASCHF PAUL [DE]) [A] 1-16 |