EP0677655 - Fuel pressure control using hysteresis pump drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills Michigan 48326-2980 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states Siemens Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Danny O. 615 Sea Pines Lane Newport News, Virginia 23602 / US | 02 /
Wakeman, Russell J. 20 Evelyn Drive Newport News, Virginia 23602 / US | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Epping, Wilhelm Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/42] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95105124.2 | 05.04.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | US19940226146 | 11.04.1994 Original published format: US 226146 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677655 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677655 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | [1997/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02M39/02, F02D41/38 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
F02D41/3845 (EP,US);
F02M39/02 (EP,US);
F02M63/0225 (EP,US);
F02B2275/14 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0602 (EP,US);
F02D2250/31 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/42] | Title | German: | Brennstoffdrucksteuerung unter Verwendung eines Hysterese-Pumpenantriebes | [1995/42] | English: | Fuel pressure control using hysteresis pump drive | [1995/42] | French: | Commande de pression de carburant utilisant un entraînement de pompe à hystérésis | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 03.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.10.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   08.10.1997 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5284119 (SMITLEY MARION L [US]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 42 * * column 4, line 13 - line 23 * * column 4, line 37 - line 56 * * column 5, line 1 - line 32 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 35 * * column 7, line 21 - column 8, line 36 * * column 9, line 27 - line 56 * * column 11, line 20 - line 43 * * column 16, line 30 - line 44 * [Y] 7,3,4,8-11; | [Y]US5237975 (BETKI RANDALL A [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,8-11 * figure - * * column 1, line 5 - line 26 * * column 1, line 52 - column 3, line 33 * * column 4, line 30 - line 48 *; | [A]US4800859 (SAGISAKA YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6 * figures 1,3,4,6-10 * * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 14 * * column 4, line 14 - line 49 * * column 8, line 4 - line 31 *; | [Y]US3985468 (LEWIS LEON DAVID) [Y] 7 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 12 - line 29 * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 16 * |