EP0677741 - Oxygen sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Noboru 1-4-38-703, Sentai, Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka City, 558 / JP | 02 /
Gamou, Takaharu 12-3, Kasugaoka 3-chome Fujiidera City, 583 / JP | 03 /
Yasumoto, Eiichi 5-8-104, Myokenzaka Katano City, 576 / JP | 04 /
Tsuluda, Kunihiro 7-12-21, Shirakashi-cho Kashihara City, 634 / JP | 05 /
Ito, Nobuhisa 2-3-20, Nango Otsu City, 520 / JP | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95105217.4 | 06.04.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | JP19940073137 | 12.04.1994 Original published format: JP 7313794 | JP19940308603 | 13.12.1994 Original published format: JP 30860394 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677741 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677741 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12, G01N27/407 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
G01N27/4073 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/42] | G01N27/12 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/42] | Title | German: | Sauerstoffsensor | [1995/42] | English: | Oxygen sensor | [1995/42] | French: | Capteur d'oxygène | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 02.07.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2206571 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC) [X] 1-5,7,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 6,8,9,12-14; | [XAY]EP0523696 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 7,10 [Y] 9,14; | [Y]DE3815004 (GIMAT) [Y] 12,13 * abstract *; | [YA]JPH04115153 ; | [Y]JPS6383661 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920807), vol. 016, no. 368, Database accession no. (P - 1398), & JP04115153 A 19920416 (TOTO LTD) [Y] 6 * abstract * [A] 10-13 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880829), vol. 012, no. 317, Database accession no. (P - 750), & JP63083661 A 19880414 (FUJIKURA LTD) [Y] 8 * abstract * |