Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0676719
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
22.12.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] |
08.09.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
07.01.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] |
10.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.11.1998 |
Change - German title |
published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] |
25.11.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.04.1998 |
First examination report |
|
31.03.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.11.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |
22.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.04.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] |
14.03.1997 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] |
14.03.1997 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] |
31.01.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
25.08.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] |