EP0676719 - Apparatus for generating images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/41] | Method and apparatus for generating images | ||
[1999/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 7-1-1 Akasaka, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 7-1-1 Akasaka, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | ||
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuoki, Masakazu Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yutaka, Teiji Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Furuhashi, Makoto Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Masayoshi Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/41] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95105312.3 | 07.04.1995 | [1995/41] | Priority number, date | JP19940095717 | 08.04.1994 Original published format: JP 9571794 | [1995/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0676719 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0676719 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0676719 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/20, G06T3/00, G06T15/10 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
G06T11/00 (EP,KR,US);
G06T1/60 (EP,US);
G06T3/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/41] | G06T3/00, G06T15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1995/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Darstellung von Bildern | [1999/02] | English: | Apparatus for generating images | [1999/02] | French: | Appareil pour la génération d'images | [1999/02] |
Former [1995/41] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Darstellung von Bildern | ||
Former [1995/41] | Method and apparatus for generating images | ||
Former [1995/41] | Procédé et appareil pour la génération d'images | Examination procedure | 05.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0425187 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,4* abstract *; | [Y]EP0430501 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [Y] 4-10 * abstract *; | [E]EP0676722 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-5 * column 10, line 45 - column 11, line 2 * * column 11, lines 53-56; figures 4C,5 * * column 19, lines 27-35; figures 3,7 * * column 1, lines 12-20 * * column 6, lines 24-32; figure 1 * * column 7, lines 5-12 *; | [XY] - FOLEY ET AL, Computer Graphics, Principles and Practice, USA, 2ND EDITION, ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1990), XP002025053 [X] 1 * pages 304-308 * * pages 201-205 * [Y] 2-10 | [Y] - R. SEDGEWICK, Algorithms in C++, USA, ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1992), XP002025054 [Y] 2,3 * pages 15-22 * * paragraph "linked lists" * | by applicant | JPH05190763 | JPH05190764 | JPH05258625 | JPH0627405 |