Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.01.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
08.11.1996 | Examination report or reply | |
02.08.1996 | First examination report | |
31.07.1996 | Examination report or reply | |
12.04.1996 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] |
15.09.1995 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] |