EP0679507 - Barrier film with electroconductive outer layers and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolff Walsrode Aktiengesellschaft 29699 Walsrode / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states WOLFF WALSRODE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-29699 Walsrode / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schultze, Dirk, Dr. Kolkweg 6 D-29683 Fallingbostel / DE | 02 /
Bochow, Ricarda, Dipl.-Ing. Tietlinger Lönsweg 55 D-29683 Fallingbostel / DE | [1995/44] | Representative(s) | Braun, Rolf, et al Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Braun, Rolf, Dr., et al Bayer AG, Konzernzentrale RP, Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95105543.3 | 12.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | DE19944414335 | 25.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4414335 | [1995/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0679507 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/20, B32B27/30, B32B27/34, B65D65/40, H05F1/02 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (US);
B32B27/18 (US);
B32B27/20 (US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
C09J175/04 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (US);
B32B2307/202 (US);
B32B2307/514 (US);
B32B2307/516 (US);
B32B2307/518 (US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1995/44] | Title | German: | Sperrschichtfolie mit leitfähigen Aussenschichten sowie ihre Verwendung | [1995/44] | English: | Barrier film with electroconductive outer layers and its use | [1995/44] | French: | Film barrière avec couche exterieure conductrice et son utilisation | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 02.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0114802 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [Y] 1,5 * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 27; claims 1-6,9,10 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 18 *; | [YA]EP0219315 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1,3-7,10 * page 18, line 30 - page 19, line 16; figures 3,6,1; claims 1,3-5,8,10-13 * [A] 2; | [Y]EP0236099 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [Y] 1,3-6,9 * page 2, lines 1-28 - page 5, lines 3-27; figure 2; claims 1,6 * * page 16, line 22 - page 17, line 27 * * page 19, line 22; examples 3,5 *; | [Y]US4833010 (LANGLEY JOHN D [US]) [Y] 1,7,8 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0397185 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [Y] 10* page 2, lines 30-35 - page 8, lines 8-40; figure 2; claims 1,4,9 *; | [Y]US5129544 (JACOBSON WENDELL L [US], et al) [Y] 1,7-9 * column 4, lines 5-43; figure 3; claim 1 9 1018 19 24 *; | [Y]EP0512364 (TETRA ALFA HOLDINGS [CH]) [Y] 1,7,8 * column 2, lines 1-27; figure .; claims 1,4,6,9 *; | [PX]EP0624463 (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE]) [PX] 1,3-9 * page 2, lines 42-58; claims 1,4-10 * |