EP0677613 - Apparatus for depositing at least one fluent material onto a moving web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2000/51] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen Gesellschaft mbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernert, Richard Ebertstrasse 48 D-89537 Giengen / DE | 02 /
Reich, Stefan Th.-Schäfer-Strasse 11 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/24] |
Former [1995/42] | Kohlmann, Karl Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95105633.2 | 13.04.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | DE19944413232 | 15.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4413232 | [1995/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677613 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677613 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677613 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/56 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
D21H23/56 (EP,US);
B05C1/083 (KR);
B05C3/125 (KR);
B05C9/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auftragen von mindestens einem flüssigen Medium auf eine laufende Materialbahn | [1995/42] | English: | Apparatus for depositing at least one fluent material onto a moving web | [1995/42] | French: | Dispositif pour déposer au moins un matériau fluide sur une bande en mouvement | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 10.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.10.2002 | GB | 30.10.2002 | IT | 30.10.2002 | SE | 30.01.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | CH | 30.04.2003 | LI | 30.04.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 30.10.2002 | |
GB | 30.10.2002 | ||
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 30.10.2002 | |
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | SE | 30.01.2003 | |
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 30.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE8414904U (JAGENBERG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [DA] 1-3,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9111669U (J. M. VOITH GMBH) [A] 1-13* figure 2 *; | [A]US5112653 (DAMRAU WAYNE A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0571849 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9516073 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document * |