EP0686821 - Cooler adapted for two layers of charge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRUPP POLYSIUS AG Graf-Galen-Strasse 17 59269 Beckum / DE | [1998/38] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states KRUPP POLYSIUS AG Graf-Galen-Strasse 17 D-59269 Beckum / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nienaber, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Aldegrever Weg 1 D-59227 Ahlen / DE | 02 /
Niemerg, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing. Holtrup 33 D-59320 Ennigerloh / DE | 03 /
Driemeier, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Martenshöhe 26 D-49536 Lienen / DE | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar, et al Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur., et al Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95105650.6 | 13.04.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | DE19944419729 | 06.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4419729 | [1995/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686821 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686821 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F27D15/02 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
F27D15/0213 (EP,US);
F25D13/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/50] | Title | German: | Zweischichtkühler | [1995/50] | English: | Cooler adapted for two layers of charge | [1995/50] | French: | Refroidisseur à deux couches de charge | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE527173U (MIAG); | [AD]DE1097346 (SMIDTH & CO AS F L); | [A]DE1303526 (POLYSIUS AG) |