EP0682463 - Cooled bottom electrode for a direct current electric furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | Opposition rejected | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | [2004/03] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gensini, Gianni Quartiere Industriale I-33030 S. Stefano di Buia (UD) / IT | 02 /
Pavlicevic, Milorad Via Pracchiuso 31/7 I-33100 Udine / IT | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 95105747.0 | 18.04.1995 | [1995/46] | Priority number, date | IT1994UD00082 | 11.05.1994 Original published format: IT UD940082 | [1995/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0682463 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0682463 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H05B7/06 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
H05B7/06 (EP,US);
F27B3/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/46] | Title | German: | Gekühlter Bodenelektrode für einem elektrischer Gleichstromofen | [1995/46] | English: | Cooled bottom electrode for a direct current electric furnace | [1995/46] | French: | Electrode de fond refroidie pour four électrique à courant continu | [1995/46] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Valentin-Gihske-Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Valentin-Gihske-Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | 19.11.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.03.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.02.2006 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/29] | 14.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.03.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.01.2004 | FR | 14.01.2004 | SE | 14.04.2004 | GB | 18.04.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/46] | BE | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
GB | 18.04.2004 | ||
FR | 14.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | BE | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
GB | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | BE | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 14.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4125737 (ANDERSSON CONNY) [A] 1 * column 3, paragraph 59 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 37 - column 4, line 41 *; | [A]FR2437760 (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH) [A] 1 * claims 1,2,6 *; | [A]GB2149279 (MANNESMANN AG); | [A]EP0178981 (USINOR [FR]); | [A]GB2184527 (MANNESMANN AG) |