EP0679663 - Process for the manufacture of water-dilutable binders and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1997/44] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Volker, Dr. Fliethweg 36 D-47669 Wachtendonk / DE | 02 /
Arning, Eberhard Krefelder Strasse 39 D-41564 Kaarst / DE | 03 /
Blum, Harald, Dr. Auf dem Westkamp 1 D-47669 Wachtendonk / DE | 04 /
Wamprecht, Christian, Dr. Regattastrasse 20 D-41472 Neuss / DE | [1995/44] | Application number, filing date | 95105768.6 | 18.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | DE19944414988 | 29.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4414988 | [1995/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0679663 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0679663 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0679663 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/14, C08F8/44, C08F8/08 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
C08F8/14 (EP,US);
C08F2800/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/14, C08F8/44, C08F220/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von wasserverdünnbaren Bindemitteln und deren Verwendung | [1995/44] | English: | Process for the manufacture of water-dilutable binders and use thereof | [1995/44] | French: | Procédé de préparation de liants diluables à l'eau et leur application | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 29.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1914559 (MOBIL OIL CORP) [A] 1* page 5 - page 6; claims 1-7 *; | [A]GB1511652 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON) [A] 1 * claims 1-16 *; | [Y]EP0285933 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 9; claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0349810 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-9 *; | [DY]EP0350684 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DY] 1-6 * page 2, line 38 - page 4, line 35 * * page 5, line 7 - line 24 * * page 5, line 33 - line 55; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0372295 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 49; claims 1-7 *; | [Y]EP0428956 (GIULINI CHEMIE [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-5 * |