blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0680171

EP0680171 - Low power security mode for a cellular telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.10.2001 [2001/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[1995/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Gustafson, David Timothy
1202 W. Sand Hills Court
Gilbert, Arizona 85234 / US
02 / Savage, Michael Allen
4182 W. Ivanhoe Court
Chandler, Arizona 85226 / US
03 / Kennedy, Paul Roy
2441 S. Saratoga
Mesa, Arizona 85202 / US
04 / Kish, Joseph III
1009 N. Osprey Court
Gilbert, Arizona 85234 / US
05 / Fette, Bruce Alan
2310 W. Del Campo
Mesa, Arizona 85202 / US
[1995/44]
Representative(s)Hudson, Peter David, et al
Motorola
European Intellectual Property
Midpoint
Alencon Link, Basingstoke
Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/44]Hudson, Peter David, et al
Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date95105784.318.04.1995
[1995/44]
Priority number, dateUS1994023479328.04.1994         Original published format: US 234793
[1995/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0680171
Date:02.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0680171
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04L9/00, H04K1/00
[2000/03]
CPC:
H04L9/00 (EP,US); H04W12/03 (EP,US); H04L2209/30 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US); Y02D30/70 (EP)
Former IPC [1995/44]H04L9/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI [1995/44]
TitleGerman:Sicherheitsmodul mit niedriger Leistung für ein Zellulartelefon[1995/44]
English:Low power security mode for a cellular telephone[1995/44]
French:Module de sécurité à faible puissance pour téléphone cellulaire[1995/44]
Examination procedure26.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
20.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/44]
28.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9323938  (TECSEC INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 9 - line 13 * * page 3, line 18 - line 20 * * page 9, line 1 - line 5 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 27 *;
 [X]  - CAPRIONI D M ET AL, "ANDVT MINTERM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. (MILCOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1991), vol. 3, ISBN 0-87942-691-8, page 1197-1203, XP000273884 [X] 1,2,5,7 * abstract * * page 1198, column L, paragraph 3 - page 1199, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 1201, line 7 - line 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.1991.258458
 [X]  - DIEZ-DEL-RIO L ET AL, "SECURE SPEECH AND DATA COMMUNICATION OVER THE PUBLIC SWITCHING TELEPHONE NETWORK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, ANDSIGNAL PROCESSING. (ICASSP),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19940419), vol. CONF. 19, ISBN 0-7803-1776-9, page II-425-II-428, XP000528508 [X] 1,7,10 * page 425, column L, line 1 - column R, line 9 * * page 427, column R, line 14 - line 18 *
 [A]  - MCGONEGAL C A ET AL, "Digital signal processor: private communications", BELL SYSTEM TECHNICAL JOURNAL, SEPT. 1981, USA, MURRAY HILL, vol. 60, no. 7, pt.2, ISSN 0005-8580, pages 1563 - 1572, XP002124097 [A] 1 * page 1563, line 1 - page 1564, line 15 * * page 1566, line 23 - line 30 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.