EP0683099 - Device for feeding empty bags to a packaging machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paper Converting Machine GmbH Mühlweg 4/10 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | [1998/32] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states Paper Converting Machine GmbH Mühlweg 4 D-67105 Schifferstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wald, Ulrich Im Binzfeld 129 D-67346 Speyer / DE | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/04] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/47] | Petersen, Frank, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Petersen, Patentanwälte, Bismarckstrasse 16 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 95105896.5 | 20.04.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | DE19944417689 | 20.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4417689 | [1995/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683099 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683099 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/14 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
B65B43/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/47] | Extension states | LT | 20.04.1995 | SI | 20.04.1995 | Title | German: | Leerbeutelzuführung für Verpackungsmaschine | [1995/47] | English: | Device for feeding empty bags to a packaging machine | [1995/47] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation de sacs vides à une machine d'emballage | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 18.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 05.08.1998 | NL | 05.08.1998 | DK | 05.11.1998 | PT | 05.11.1998 | AT | 20.04.1999 | LU | 20.04.1999 | BE | 30.04.1999 | CH | 30.04.1999 | LI | 30.04.1999 | IE | 04.05.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | GR | 05.08.1998 | |
NL | 05.08.1998 | ||
DK | 05.11.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
AT | 20.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
IE | 04.05.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GR | 05.08.1998 | |
NL | 05.08.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
AT | 20.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
MC | 30.04.1999 | ||
IE | 04.05.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GR | 05.08.1998 | |
NL | 05.08.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
AT | 20.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
IE | 04.05.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
AT | 20.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
IE | 04.05.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 05.08.1998 | |
IE | 05.08.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
AT | 20.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | IE | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
AT | 20.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | IE | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | IE | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/20] | IE | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 05.11.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1188352 (AMERICAN MACH & FOUNDRY [US]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 40 - page 2, line 65; figures 1,3 * [Y] 7; | [Y]GB2088334 (CMB DISPLAY GROUP LTD) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0362579 (MCGREGOR HAROLD R); | [A]DE9200372U (HAVER & BOECKER); | [A]DE4143342 (BUEHLER AG [CH]) |