blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0678638

EP0678638 - Electromechanical lock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/43]Intrusion security and signal system with electromechanical lock
[1998/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.1999
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SN TEC Sicherheits- & Notruftechnik GmbH
Karl-Gustav-Wunder-Str. 1
04683 Albrechtshain / DE
[1998/30]
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
NAKURA Alarmtechnik Gesellschaft bürgerlichen Rechts
Holzweissigstrasse 7
04860 Torgau / DE
Former [1995/43]For all designated states
NAKURA Wach-und Sicherheitsdienst GmbH
Holzweissigstrasse 7
D-04860 Torgau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jankowski, Werner
Herzberger Strasse 11
D-04895 Züllsdorf / DE
02 / Hentschel, Ingolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Dorfstrasse 37
D-04860 Losswig / DE
03 / Krausch, Egon
Breite Strasse 11
D-04860 Torgau / DE
[1995/43]
Representative(s)Voigt, Wolf-Rüdiger
Patentanwalt, Alter Markt 1-2
06108 Halle / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/43]Voigt, Wolf-Rüdiger
Patentanwalt, Alter Markt 1-2
D-06108 Halle / DE
Application number, filing date95105987.221.04.1995
[1995/43]
Priority number, dateDE1994441423123.04.1994         Original published format: DE 4414231
DE1994442063014.06.1994         Original published format: DE 4420630
DE1994444064314.11.1994         Original published format: DE 4440643
[1995/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0678638
Date:25.10.1995
Language:DE
[1995/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0678638
Date:16.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.1995
ClassificationIPC:E05B45/06, E05B59/00, G08B13/22, E05B63/16
[1995/43]
CPC:
G08B13/22 (EP); E05B45/06 (EP); E05B2045/0695 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/43]
TitleGerman:Elektromechanischem Schaltschloss[1998/51]
English:Electromechanical lock[1998/51]
French:Serrure électromécanique[1998/51]
Former [1995/43]Einbruchsicherungs- und Meldeanlage mit elektromechanischem Schaltschloss
Former [1995/43]Intrusion security and signal system with electromechanical lock
Former [1995/43]Système de sécurité anti-intrusion et de signalisation avec serrure électromécanique
Examination procedure27.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/09]
24.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.06.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.1998Fee for grant paid
16.09.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.09.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR16.12.1998
DK16.03.1999
PT16.03.1999
SE16.03.1999
LU21.04.1999
BE30.04.1999
[2004/39]
Former [2003/45]GR16.12.1998
DK16.03.1999
PT16.03.1999
SE16.03.1999
BE30.04.1999
Former [2003/17]GR16.12.1998
PT16.03.1999
SE16.03.1999
BE30.04.1999
MC30.04.1999
Former [2001/23]GR16.12.1998
PT16.03.1999
SE16.03.1999
BE30.04.1999
Former [2000/24]PT16.03.1999
BE30.04.1999
Former [1999/32]PT16.03.1999
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0173421  (YAMASHITA TOSHIHIKO) [A] 5* abstract *;
 [A]FR2598535  (LAUDREN CIE SA ETS M [FR]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]US4818971  (PATRICK ROBERT H [CA]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *
by applicantDE3003935
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.