EP0679888 - Method for determining capability of imparting growth activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 9-11, Nihonbashihoridome-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Kureha Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 9-11, Nihonbashihoridome-cho 1-Chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oguchi, Yoshiharu 10-13-501, Nerima 3-chome Nerika-ku, Tokyo 179 / JP | 02 /
Matsunaga, Kenichi 989-17 Oazakamiarai Tokorozawa-shi, Sautana 359 / JP | [1995/44] | Representative(s) | Minderop, Ralph H. Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Minderop, Ralph H., Dr. rer. nat. Cohausz & Florack, Patentanwälte, Kanzlerstrasse 8a D-40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106191.0 | 26.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | JP19940114387 | 28.04.1994 Original published format: JP 11438794 | [1995/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0679888 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0679888 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, G01N33/60, G01N33/68, C12Q1/02, G01N33/50 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
G01N33/5047 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/44] | G01N33/48, G01N33/60, G01N33/68, C12Q1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Fähigkeit zur Erzeugung von Wachstumsaktivität | [1995/44] | English: | Method for determining capability of imparting growth activity | [1995/44] | French: | Méthode pour déterminer la capacité de donner une activité de croissance | [1995/44] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 26.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 10.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/28] | 27.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04169194 ; | [X]JPH06116290 ; | [A]EP0348212 (CA ATOMIC ENERGY LTD [CA]) [A] 1* column W * | [X] - C. FIOCCHI ET AL., "Interleukin 2 activity of human intestinal mucosa mononuclear cells. Decreased levels in inflammatory bowel disease.", MEDLINE, KNIGHT-RIDDER INFO [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [ ] - GASTROENTEROLOGY, WASHINGTON US, vol. 86, no. 4, pages 734 - 742 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 31, Database accession no. an 92-253397, & JPH04169194 A 19901031 (M. MIYASAKA ET AL.) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 21, Database accession no. an 94-173760, & JPH06116290 A 19940426 (BIOMATERIAL KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - R.W. NADEAU ET AL., "Quantification of recombinant Interleukin 2 in human serum by a specific immunobioassay", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, COLUMBUS US, (19890801), vol. 61, pages 1732 - 1736 [A] 1-4,6,8,9 * the whole document * | [DA] - T. HATTORI ET AL., JAPANESE JOURNAL OF SURGERY, TOKYO JP, vol. 20, no. 2, pages 127 - 136 [DA] 1,2,6-10 * the whole document * |