EP0680028 - Traffic control system for directing alternating one-way passing of vehicles around a road-work site section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/44] | A system for traffic signals for one-side passing | ||
[1999/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Samicon Co. Ltd. 1-8-23 Bentenbashi-Dori Niigata-shi Niigata-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Nihon Samicon Co. Ltd. 1-8-23 Bentenbashi-Dori Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nomura, Toshimitsu, c/o Nihon Samicon Co. Ltd. 1-8-23 Bentenbashi-Dori Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Akira, c/o Nihon Samicon Co. Ltd. 1-8-23 Bentenbashi-Dori Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 03 /
Ishizaki, Minoru, c/o Nihon Samicon Co. Ltd. 1-8-23 Bentenbashi-Dori Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 04 /
Takeda, Kaoru 1-5-7 Nakajima, Igarashi Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | 05 /
Yasui, Kazuhiko, c/o Japan Univ., Faculty of Science and Eng., 7-24-1 Narashino-Dai Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1995/44] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/44] | Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106219.9 | 25.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | JP19940091775 | 28.04.1994 Original published format: JP 9177594 | JP19940255551 | 20.10.1994 Original published format: JP 25555194 | [1995/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0680028 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0680028 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | [1997/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680028 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/07, G08G1/08 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
G08G1/07 (EP,US);
G08G1/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/44] | G08G1/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/44] | Title | German: | Verkehrssteuersystem zum Leiten der abwechselnden einseitigen Durchfahrt von Fahrzeugen an einer Strassenbaustelle | [1999/43] | English: | Traffic control system for directing alternating one-way passing of vehicles around a road-work site section | [1999/43] | French: | Système de contrôle de trafic pour diriger des véhicules passant en alternance sur une voie pour éviter un chantier routier | [1999/43] |
Former [1995/44] | Verkehrssignalgeberanlage für einseitige Durchfahrt | ||
Former [1995/44] | A system for traffic signals for one-side passing | ||
Former [1995/44] | Système pour feux de signalisation routière pour passage sur un côté | Examination procedure | 26.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2000 | CH | 28.06.2000 | FR | 28.06.2000 | IT | 28.06.2000 | LI | 28.06.2000 | DE | 29.09.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
CH | 28.06.2000 | ||
FR | 28.06.2000 | ||
LI | 28.06.2000 | ||
DE | 29.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
CH | 28.06.2000 | ||
LI | 28.06.2000 | ||
DE | 29.09.2000 | ||
FR | 24.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
CH | 28.06.2000 | ||
LI | 28.06.2000 | ||
FR | 24.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
FR | 24.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 28.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2359451 (STEIN HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 21, line 37 - page 24, line 8; figure 12 *; | [A]EP0086420 (FABEMA FUNKAMPELDIENST MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]EP0564062 (TEWICON ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERUN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |