EP0685546 - Fabric adhesive tape [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | Opposition rejected | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Tesa AG Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 D-20245 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spies, Manfred, Dr. Alte Strasse 31 D-35216 Biedenkopf 2 / DE | 02 /
Leydecker, Heiko Kreienredder 100 D-24730 Neustadt/Holstein / DE | 03 /
Külper, Klaus, Dr. Fehrstrasse 1a D-25421 Pinneberg / DE | [1995/49] | Application number, filing date | 95106310.6 | 27.04.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | DE19944419169 | 01.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4419169 | [1995/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685546 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685546 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/04, C09J11/04 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
C09J11/04 (EP,US);
C09J7/21 (EP,US);
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
C09J2203/302 (EP,US);
C09J2400/263 (EP,US);
C09J2433/005 (EP,US);
Y10S428/921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2891 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/49] | Title | German: | Gewebeklebeband | [1995/49] | English: | Fabric adhesive tape | [1995/49] | French: | Ruban adhésif tissé | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 13.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.09.2001
24.09.2001
ADMISSIBLE Certoplast Vorwerk & Sohn GmbH Müngstener Stra e 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Nunnenkamp, Jörg Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.09.2001
Certoplast Vorwerk & Sohn GmbH Müngstener Stra e 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Nunnenkamp, Jörg, Dr. Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Patentanwälte Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | 30.11.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.03.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.09.2003 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/12] | 25.09.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.10.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0038899 (NASA [US])[A] 1,2,5 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index [X] 1,2,5,7 |