EP0740319 - Device for fault arc limitation on switching cabinet push-in units of a switching installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [1996/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krafft, Henning, Dipl. Ing. Hinter der Kirche 3 D-24534 Neumünster / DE | 02 /
Petersen, Ulrich, Dipl. Ing. Zum Amt 11b D-24229 Dänischenhagen / DE | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Erbacher, Alfons Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Bockenheimer Landstrasse 101 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Erbacher, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing. Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106391.6 | 27.04.1995 | [1996/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740319 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01H31/00, H02B11/04 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
H02B1/21 (EP);
H02B11/00 (EP);
H01H2001/5827 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/44] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Begrenzung von Störlichtbogen auf Geräteeinschüben in Motorschaltschranken | [1996/44] | English: | Device for fault arc limitation on switching cabinet push-in units of a switching installation | [1996/44] | French: | Dispositif pour la limitation des arcs de défaut dans des tiroirs aux armoires électriques | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/09] | 09.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.06.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3729454 (RITTER STARKSTROM GMBH & CO) [X] 1 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 43; figures 1,5-8 * [A] 3,4; | [A]FR2028063 (N. V. "COQ") [A] 1 * page 1, line 14 - page 3, line 2; figure . *; | [DA]DE1908785 [DA] 1; | [A]DE3441870 (RITTER STARKSTROMTECHNIK GMBH & CO) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4116983 (DODUCO GMBH + CO DR. EUGEN DÜRRWÄCHTER) [A] 1 * abstract * |