Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0680691
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
10.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
28.04.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] |
23.07.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] |
02.07.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] |
11.06.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
10.07.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] |
15.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.01.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
19.01.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.10.1997 |
First examination report |
|
15.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.01.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] |
22.09.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] |