EP0680691 - Plant tray [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Pöppelmann, Kunststoffwerk-Werkzeugbau Bakumer Strasse 73 49393 Lohne / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states Gebr. Pöppelmann, Kunststoffwerk-Werkzeugbau Bakumer Strasse 73 D-49393 Lohne / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orschulik, Günther Zeppelinstrasse 2a D-49377 Vechta / DE | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Postfach 12 26 D-49002 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106421.1 | 28.04.1995 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | DE19940007266U | 02.05.1994 Original published format: DE 9407266 U | [1995/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0680691 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680691 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/10 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
B65D21/0209 (EP);
A01G9/0295 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/45] | Title | German: | Pflanzenpalette | [1995/45] | English: | Plant tray | [1995/45] | French: | Plateau pour plantes | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 17.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.08.1998 | FR | 26.08.1998 | GB | 26.08.1998 | IT | 26.08.1998 | BE | 30.04.1999 | CH | 30.04.1999 | LI | 30.04.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 26.08.1998 | |
FR | 26.08.1998 | ||
GB | 26.08.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 26.08.1998 | |
GB | 26.08.1998 | ||
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | GB | 26.08.1998 | |
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | GB | 26.08.1998 | |
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | GB | 26.08.1998 | |
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/30] | GB | 26.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4236736 (RATH) [X] 1 * column 4, line 20 - line 33; figures 4,5 * [Y] 2,12-15; | [YA]DE9319024U (DÜMMEN) [Y] 2,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 1,3,4; | [XP]DE9407266U (GEBR. PÖPPELMANN) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2161541 (EMBALLAGES INDUSTRIELS TAILLEUR FILS LYON ET AL.) [A] 1,12,13 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2354700 (CURVER) [A] 1,13-15 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 23; figure - *; | [A]US4769946 (DE GROOT ET AL.); | [A]GB1034256 (MARCAN) |