|
06.10.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.06.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (reply to communication from Examining Division too late) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.10.1999 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.1999 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1999 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.1999 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.08.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
01.07.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.04.1996 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
33 |