10.10.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
13.09.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] |
21.09.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] |
07.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.06.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] |
27.04.2001 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] |
02.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.11.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.11.2000 |
Change - German title |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
22.08.2000 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
10.08.2000 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
09.08.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
09.08.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.08.2000 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
19.07.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
30.06.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.06.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
08.05.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.03.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] |
15.03.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.10.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.10.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] |
14.10.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
28.09.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
20.09.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.09.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
06.07.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
21.05.1999 |
Change - representative |
published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] |
22.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.03.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.11.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.02.1998 |
First examination report |
|
17.02.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.09.1996 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] |
27.09.1996 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] |
17.05.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] |
22.09.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] |