EP0683528 - Electro-optic integrated circuit and method of fabrication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1995/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holm, Paige 3714 E. Salinas Phoenix, Arizona 85044 / US | 02 /
Rhyne, George W. 3714 E. Minnezona Avenue Scottsdale, Arizona 85251 / US | 03 /
Walczak, Thomas J. 3070 Boerderij Way Woodstock, Illinois 60098 / US | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95106708.1 | 04.05.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | US19940239626 | 09.05.1994 Original published format: US 239626 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683528 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/15 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
H01L27/156 (EP,US);
H01L33/00 (KR);
Y10S257/921 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1995/47] | Title | German: | Elektrooptische integrierte Schaltung und ihre Herstellungsmethode | [1995/47] | English: | Electro-optic integrated circuit and method of fabrication | [1995/47] | French: | Circuit intégré électrooptique et procédé de fabrication associé | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/36] | 19.04.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH02177096 ; | [XA]JPS60224198 ; | [A]JPH04212479 ; | [A]EP0011418 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD [GB]) [A] 6-10* column A *; | [A]EP0282653 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 3,8-10 * column A *; | [A]US4956683 (QUINTANA VICTOR E [US]) [A] 7-10 * column A *; | [A]US5051738 (TANIELIAN ARAM [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 19; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5062115 (THORNTON ROBERT L [US]) [A] 2,6-10 * column A * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900926), vol. 14, no. 449, Database accession no. (P - 1111), & JP2177096 A 00000000 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 2-4,6-10 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860408), vol. 10, no. 89, Database accession no. (P - 444), & JP60224198 A 00000000 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 2-4,6-10 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921127), vol. 16, no. 558, Database accession no. (E - 1294), & JP4212479 A 00000000 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 4 * abstract * |