EP0681976 - Sheet retaining device in an out-feed station of a machine for processing sheet elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOBST S.A. Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states BOBST S.A. Case Postale CH-1001 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kernen, Jean-Pierre Rose des Vents CH-1307 Villars-Lussery / CH | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Colomb, Claude BOBST S.A., Service des Brevets, Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Colomb, Claude BOBST S.A., Service des Brevets, Case Postale CH-1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 95106870.9 | 06.05.1995 | [1995/46] | Priority number, date | CH19940001493 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: CH 149394 | [1995/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681976 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65H31/32 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
B65H31/32 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2301/42256 (EP,US);
B65H2405/323 (EP,US);
B65H2701/176 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/46] | Title | German: | Platten-Rückhaltevorrichtung in einer Auslegerstation einer Maschine zur Behandlung von plattenförmigen Elementen | [1995/46] | English: | Sheet retaining device in an out-feed station of a machine for processing sheet elements | [1995/46] | French: | Dispositif de retenue d'éléments en plaque au sein d'une station de réception d'une machine de traitement de tels éléments | [1995/46] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 10.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 12.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3148780 (LINDEMANN ROBERT E) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 6 - line 70; figure - * [Y] 3; | [XAY]US1699284 (ENGLISH FRED S, et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 4 [Y] 3; | [XP]US5360315 (KURKOWSKI RONALD J [US], et al) [XP] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US3285607 (LINDEMANN ROBERT E) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0407728 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3836984 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG [DD]) [Y] 3 * the whole document * |