EP0683275 - Actuating device for a flush valve of a flushing cistern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friatec Aktiengesellschaft Steinzeugstrasse 50 68229 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states FRIATEC Aktiengesellschaft Steinzeugstrasse 50 68229 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states Friatec Aktiengesellschaft Keramik- und Kunststoffwerke Steinzeugstrasse 50 D-68229 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states Abu-Plast Kunststoffbetriebe GmbH Am Bahnhof 20 D-96472 Rödental / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Büchner, Andreas Am Rabersbach 26 D-96472 Rödental / DE | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Meinrad Reble & Klose Rechts- und Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schmitt, Meinrad Rechts- und Patentanwälte Reble & Klose Patente & Marken Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1995/47] | Schmitt, Meinrad, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Hans Klose, Dipl.-Ing. M. Schmitt, Kurfürstenstrasse 32 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106888.1 | 06.05.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | DE19944417722 | 20.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4417722 | [1995/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0683275 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0683275 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E03D1/14 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
E03D1/142 (EP);
E03D2001/147 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/47] | Extension states | SI | 06.05.1995 | Title | German: | Betätigungseinrichtung für eine Ablaufarmatur eines Spülkastens | [1995/47] | English: | Actuating device for a flush valve of a flushing cistern | [1995/47] | French: | Dispositif pour l'actionnement d'un clapet de vidange d'un réservoir de chasse d'eau | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 03.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2137248 (WISA BV) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2548328 (GEBERIT AG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0426224 (CECCHI ENZO [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0479716 (GEBERIT AG [CH]) [DA] 1* the whole document * |