EP0681916 - Method and apparatus for feeding print media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sterling Dry Imaging Systems, Inc. Glasgow Business Community, P.O. Box 6101 Newark, DE 19714-6101 / US | [1997/35] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Obermiller, Margaret A. 71 Oxbow Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 02 /
Triggs, Charles W. 80 Observatory Way Marshfield, MA 02050 / US | [2000/35] |
Former [1995/46] | 01 /
Obermiller, Margaret A. 71 Oxbow Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | ||
02 /
Triggs, Charles W. 80 Observatory Way Marshfield, MA 02050 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1997/24] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1995/46] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106988.9 | 09.05.1995 | [1995/46] | Priority number, date | US19940240245 | 10.05.1994 Original published format: US 240245 | [1995/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0681916 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0681916 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681916 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J13/03, B65H3/10 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
B65H3/10 (EP,US);
G06K13/08 (EP,US);
G06K13/16 (EP,US);
B65H2301/42324 (EP,US);
B65H2406/3314 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/46] | B41J13/03 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Zuführung von Druckmedien | [1995/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for feeding print media | [1995/46] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour l'alimentation de supports d'impression | [1995/46] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 07.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.08.2000 | DE | 01.12.2000 | GB | 09.05.2001 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/16] | DE | 01.12.2000 | |
FR | 26.01.2001 | ||
GB | 09.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/13] | DE | 01.12.2000 | |
FR | 26.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | FR | 26.01.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0031717 (WATKISS AUTOMATION LTD [GB]) [A] 1,13 * page 5, line 4 - page 11, line 21; figures 1,3A-3F *; | [A]US3806114 (CARTER S) [A] 1,13 * column 2, line 65 - column 6, line 49; figure - *; | [A]NL8301200 (OCE HELIOPRINT AS) [A] 1,13 * figure - *; | [A]US5116037 (GERLIER ANDRE [FR], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 2, line 64 - column 7, line 41; figures 1,2 * |