EP0694550 - Hydrolysable and polymerisable silanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 D-80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolter, Herbert, Dr. Steinstrasse 21 D-97950 Gerchsheim - Grossrinderfeld / DE | [1996/05] | Application number, filing date | 95107099.4 | 11.05.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | DE19944423811 | 06.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4423811 | [1996/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0694550 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0694550 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694550 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, C07F7/04 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
C07F7/04 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/05] | Title | German: | Hydrolisierbare und polymerisierbare Silane | [1996/05] | English: | Hydrolysable and polymerisable silanes | [1996/05] | French: | Silanes hydrolysables et polymerisables | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.08.2001 | IT | 08.08.2001 | NL | 08.08.2001 | DK | 08.11.2001 | SE | 08.11.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/45] | GB | 08.08.2001 | |
NL | 08.08.2001 | ||
DK | 08.11.2001 | ||
SE | 08.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GB | 08.08.2001 | |
NL | 08.08.2001 | ||
SE | 08.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | GB | 08.08.2001 | |
SE | 08.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/20] | SE | 08.11.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2159991 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0253770 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]DE4125201 (FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG EV) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |