EP0682073 - Polyolefin stabilization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willcox, Kenneth W. Rt. 2, Box 940 Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74006 / US | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/46] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr. rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Bardehle, Pagenberg & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95107168.7 | 11.05.1995 | [1995/46] | Priority number, date | US19940241538 | 12.05.1994 Original published format: US 241538 | [1995/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0682073 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0682073 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/02, C08K5/04, // (C08K5/04, 5:092, 5:15) | [1995/46] | CPC: |
C08K5/1535 (EP);
C08L23/02 (KR);
C08L23/06 (KR);
C08L23/12 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/1535, C08L23/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/46] | Title | German: | Polyolefin-Stabilisation | [1995/46] | English: | Polyolefin stabilization | [1995/46] | French: | Stabilisation de polyoléfines | [1995/46] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 10.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/10] | 18.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1114319 (BASF AG) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 33 - line 49; table - * * examples 2,3; claim . *; | [X]US5258422 (CHANG PETER I [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 8, line 39 - line 43 * | by applicant | US4376851 | US3887494 | US3900457 | US4053436 | US4151122 | US4294724 | US4392990 | US4405501 | US3248179 | US4394291 | US4326988 | US4347158 |