blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0682237

EP0682237 - Radiation detector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [1995/46]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okubo, Kazuaki
15-1-208, Miyatacho 3-chome
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
02 / Nakagawa, Yasuo
78-7 Plaza
Omiya-shi, Saitama 331 / JP
[1995/46]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/46]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date95107178.611.05.1995
[1995/46]
Priority number, dateJP1994009962113.05.1994         Original published format: JP 9962194
[1995/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0682237
Date:15.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0682237
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.1995
ClassificationIPC:G01J5/34
[1995/46]
CPC:
G01J5/12 (EP,US); G01J5/34 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1995/46]
TitleGerman:Strahlungsdetektor[1995/46]
English:Radiation detector[1995/46]
French:Détecteur de rayonnement[1995/46]
Examination procedure29.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/17]
29.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1999Date of oral proceedings
30.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.03.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1999Fee for grant paid
28.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99115267.9  / EP0957347
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3660659  (EISENMAN WESLEY L, et al) [A] 1,4-13* column A; figure . *;
 [XA]US4906849  (DUO WANG S [CN], et al) [X] 1,4-8 * column W * [A] 9-13
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.