EP0683081 - A bogie equipped with a body-tilt system for a railway car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAILWAY TECHNICAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE 2-8-38, Hikari-cho Kokubunji-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states RAILWAY TECHNICAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE 2-8-38, Hikari-cho Kokubunji-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Isao 2-16-17-506, Hagiyama-cho Higashimurayama-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [1995/47] | Fiener, Josef Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 95107628.0 | 18.05.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | JP19940130906 | 20.05.1994 Original published format: JP 13090694 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683081 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683081 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/22 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
B61F5/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT, SE [1995/47] | Title | German: | Ein mit einem Wagenkasten-Neigungssystem ausgerüstetes Drehgestell für ein Eisenbahnfahrzeug | [1995/47] | English: | A bogie equipped with a body-tilt system for a railway car | [1995/47] | French: | Un bogie avec un système d'inclinaison de la caisse pour une voiture de chemin de fer | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB525858 (CORTLANDT TAYLOR HILL) [A] 1-3 * page 5, line 8 - line 118 * * page 8, line 5 - line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2954746 (CRIPE ALAN R) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 4; figure 6 * |