EP0684118 - Method and apparatus of tempering both mould parts of a deep drawing machine of plastic films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adolf Illig Maschinenbau GmbH & Co Mauerstrasse 100 D-74081 Heilbronn / DE | [1995/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiefer, Günther Paul Gerhard Str. 24 D-74193 Schwaigern / DE | [1995/48] | Application number, filing date | 95107634.8 | 19.05.1995 | [1995/48] | Priority number, date | DE19944418064 | 24.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4418064 | [1995/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0684118 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0684118 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0684118 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29C35/00 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
B29C35/007 (EP);
B29C51/428 (EP);
B29C51/04 (EP);
B29C51/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Temperieren der beiden Werkzeughälften eines Formwerkzeuges zum Tiefziehen einer Kunststoffolie und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1995/48] | English: | Method and apparatus of tempering both mould parts of a deep drawing machine of plastic films | [1995/48] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de conditionnement en température d'un moule pour machine d'emboutissage de film plastique | [1995/48] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 13.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.01.2000 | GB | 26.01.2000 | IT | 26.01.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 26.01.2000 | |
GB | 26.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | GB | 26.01.2000 | |
FR | 23.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | FR | 23.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3135206 (ILLIG MASCHINENBAU ADOLF) [DA] 1-6 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE3743809 (KTX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4699676 (HELD KURT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US4354812 (WIEDER HORST K, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3135206 |