EP0691169 - Quick-change tool holder with length correcting device and axial cooling fluid duct [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emuge-Werk Richard Glimpel, Fabrik für Präzisionswerkzeuge, vormals Moschkau & Glimpel Nürnberger Strasse 100 D-91207 Lauf / DE | [1996/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Matschkur, Götz, Lindner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95107641.3 | 19.05.1995 | [1996/02] | Priority number, date | DE19944423432 | 05.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4423432 | [1996/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691169 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691169 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/08, B23Q1/00 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
B23Q11/1023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/02] | Title | German: | Schnellwechselfutter mit Längenausgleichsvorrichtung und achs-zentraler Kühlmittelzuführung | [1996/02] | English: | Quick-change tool holder with length correcting device and axial cooling fluid duct | [1996/02] | French: | Porte-outil à changement rapide avec disposition de correction de la longueur et amené axiale de fluide de refroidissement | [1996/02] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0434023 (DIEBOLD HELMUT GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1; claims 1-11 *; | [AD]DE4019760 (EMUGE-WERK RICHARD GLIMPEL FABRIK FÜR PRÄZISIONSWERKZEUGE) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4019760 |