EP0684282 - Process for producing a maleimide-modified heat-resistant ABS resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | For all designated states DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinmura, Tetsuya, c/o Denki Kagaku Kogyo K.K. Chiba Kojo, 6, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Konishi, Kunihiko, c/o Denki Kagaku Kogyo K.K. Chiba Kojo, 6, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95107673.6 | 18.05.1995 | [1995/48] | Priority number, date | JP19940115206 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: JP 11520694 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0684282 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0684282 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/12, C08J3/00 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
C08L25/12 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (KR);
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
C08L25/08 (EP,US);
C08L33/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/12, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mit Maleimid modifizierten wärmebestendigen ABS Harzes | [1995/48] | English: | Process for producing a maleimide-modified heat-resistant ABS resin | [1995/48] | French: | Procédé de production d'une resine ABS modifiée par la maleimide, resistante à la chaleur | [1995/48] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 29.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0134519 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]FR2329705 (LABOFINA SA [BE]) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 1 *; | [A]EP0202615 (MITSUBISHI MONSANTO CHEM [JP]) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0587907 (SUMITOMO DOW LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 * |