EP0687811 - Electromagnetically actuable fuel injection valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/11] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krohn, Klaus-Henning Ottostrasse 26 D-96047 Bamberg / DE | 02 /
Hans, Waldemar Adam-Krafft-Strasse 7F D-96050 Bamberg / DE | 03 /
Preussner, Christian Jakobsplatz 11a D-96049 Bamberg / DE | 04 /
Bayer, Johann Zur Point 6 D-96129 Strullendorf / DE | [1995/51] | Application number, filing date | 95107720.5 | 20.05.1995 | [1995/51] | Priority number, date | DE19944421429 | 18.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4421429 | [1995/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687811 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687811 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06, F02M61/16 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
F02M51/0678 (EP,US);
F02M51/061 (EP,US);
F02M61/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/51] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisch betätigbares Brennstoffeinspritzventil | [1995/51] | English: | Electromagnetically actuable fuel injection valve | [1995/51] | French: | Soupape d'injection de combustible actionnable électromagnétiquement | [1995/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 26.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0487199 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE4230376 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [A] 1 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]US5295627 (WAHBA BRENT J [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2198589 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 20 - page 6, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2526875 (ALFA ROMEO AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 20; figure . * |