EP0687029 - Apparatus and method for aligning a receiving antenna utilizing an audible tone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10330 North Meridian St. Indianapolis, IN 46206 / US | [1995/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaney, John William 18019 Sun Ridge Circle Noblesville, IN / US | 02 /
Virag, David Emery 9308A Viking Hills Court Indianapolis, IN / US | 03 /
Curtiss III, John Joseph 121 Scarborough Circle Noblesville, IN / US | [1995/52] |
Former [1995/50] | 01 /
Chaney, John William 9532 Falkirk Drive Indianapolis, IN / US | ||
02 /
Virag, David Emery 9308A Viking Hills Court Indianapolis, IN / US | |||
03 /
Curtiss III, John Joseph 121 Scarborough Circle Noblesville, IN / US | Representative(s) | Kohrs, Martin, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/16] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1995/50] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Patent Dept., Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 95107977.1 | 26.05.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | US19940257659 | 09.06.1994 Original published format: US 257659 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687029 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687029 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/12 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
H01Q1/1257 (EP,US);
H01Q1/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausrichten einer Antenne unter Verwendung eines hörbaren Tones | [1995/50] | English: | Apparatus and method for aligning a receiving antenna utilizing an audible tone | [1995/50] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'alignement d'une antenne utilisant une tonalité audible | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/32] | Request for further processing for: | 12.08.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.08.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3723114 (DEUTSCHE BUNDESPOST [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 4 - line 24 *; | [Y]EP0270958 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 7 - line 23 *; | [D]US4893288 (MAIER GERHARD [DE], et al); | [A]JPH04288730 ; | [A]GB2237686 (BRITISH SATELLITE BROADCASTING [GB]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 8 *; | [A]EP0579408 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4801940 (MA JOHN Y [US], et al) [A] * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930225), vol. 17, no. 97, Database accession no. (E - 1326), & JP4288730 A 19921013 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4893288 |