EP0684629 - Electrodeless high intensity discharge lamp energized by a rotating electric field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [1995/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lapatovich, Walter P. 135 Barnard Road Malborough, MA 01752 / US | 02 /
Butler, Scott J. 36 Comminsville Road North Oxford, MA 10537 / US | 03 /
Bochinski, Jason R. 506 West Ventennial Boulevard, Apt. No. 50 Springfield, OR 97477 / US | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95108026.6 | 24.05.1995 | [1995/48] | Priority number, date | US19940248921 | 24.05.1994 Original published format: US 248921 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0684629 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0684629 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01J65/04, H05B41/24 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
H05B41/24 (EP,US);
H01J65/04 (KR);
H01J65/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/48] | Title | German: | Elektrodenlose Entladungslampe hoher Intensität gespeist durch ein drehendes elektrisches Feld | [1995/48] | English: | Electrodeless high intensity discharge lamp energized by a rotating electric field | [1995/48] | French: | Lampe à décharge à haute intensité sans électrodes alimentée par un champ électrique tournant | [1995/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 09.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4792732 (O'LOUGHLIN JAMES P [US]) [X] 1-3,14,17,22 * column 1, line 22; figures 3,4,6,7 * * column 1, line 55 - line 68 * * column 3, line 46 - line 59 * * column 4, line 27 - line 31 * [A] 18-21 [Y] 4-6,13; | [XY]US3189901 (MARIO CUTOLO) [X] 1-3,14,21 * column 3, line 41 - line 46; figure 2 * [Y] 4-6,13; | [DXA]US5227698 (SIMPSON JAMES E [US], et al) [DX] 1,18-21 * column A; figures 2-7,13-16 * * column 1, line 52 * * column 1, line 59 - line 67 * * column 3, line 35 - line 37 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 18 - line 39 * * column 9, line 13 - line 16 * [A] 3,13,14,22; | [DYA]US5144206 (BUTLER SCOTT J [US], et al) [DY] 1-5 * column A; figure 3 * * column 1, line 49 - line 64 * * column 2, line 46 - line 55 * * claims 10-13,17,19,20 * [A] 6,9,11,13,14,17,19-22; | [DYA]DE4230029 (GTE PROD CORP [US]) [DY] 1-3,5 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - line 58 * * column 2, line 62 - line 66 * * column 3, line 41 - line 42 * * column 3, line 48 - line 64 * [A] 9,11,13,14,17,19-22; | [DYA]US5130612 (LAPATOVICH WALTER P [US], et al) [DY] 1-3,6 * column A; figure - * * column 1, line 49 - line 51 * * column 2, line 17 - line 18 * * column 3, line 19 - line 43 * [A] 9,11,13,14,17,19-22; | [DYA]US4887008 (WOOD CHARLES H [US]) [DY] 13 * column A; figure - * * column 3, line 10 - line 12 * [A] 14-16,18-21; | [DYA]EP0457242 (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]) [DY] 1-4 * column A; figures 1,4,5 * * page 4, line 41 - line 46 * * page 5, line 49 * * page 6, line 8 - line 10 * * page 6, line 33 - line 47 * * page 6, line 55 - line 56 * * page 7, line 48 - line 49 * * page 8, line 1 * * page 8, line 11 - line 17 * * page 12, line 18 * [A] 9,11,13,14,17-22; | [A]EP0524001 (MATRA MARCONI SPACE UK LTD [GB]) [A] 7-12 * column 1, line 1 - line 19 *; | [DA]EP0397421 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DA] 13,14,16,18-21 * abstract * | by applicant | US5070277 | US5130612 | US5241246 | US5144206 | US4803404 | US4972120 | US4887008 | US5227698 | US4975625 | US4504768 | US4954755 |